Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Public Act 15-37
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 554
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 323
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|