Senate | 06/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Public Act 15-38 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 563 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 264 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 181 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |