Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00940 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Bill No. 940
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 940
2+January Session, 2015 LCO No. 3559
3+ *_____SB00940PD____040815____*
4+Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT
5+Introduced by:
6+(ENV)
27
3-Public Act No. 15-38
8+General Assembly
9+
10+Raised Bill No. 940
11+
12+January Session, 2015
13+
14+LCO No. 3559
15+
16+*_____SB00940PD____040815____*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(ENV)
423
524 AN ACT CONCERNING THE SUSTAINABILITY OF THE NITROGEN CREDIT EXCHANGE PROGRAM.
625
726 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
827
928 Section 1. Section 22a-524 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
1029
1130 (a) The Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall establish a nitrogen credit exchange program to assist in the implementation of the total maximum daily load. The nitrogen credit exchange program shall apply to all publicly-owned treatment works included in the general permit issued pursuant to section 22a-522.
1231
1332 (b) The commissioner, in consultation with the Nitrogen Credit Advisory Board, shall:
1433
1534 (1) Establish a schedule and monitor all nitrogen removal construction projects;
1635
1736 (2) Establish an equivalency factor for each publicly-owned treatment works, which may be revised at the commissioner's discretion consistent with the total maximum daily load. The equivalency factor and any proposed revisions shall be made available for public comment at least thirty days prior to being implemented in the nitrogen credit exchange program;
1837
1938 (3) Establish the individual waste load allocation for each publicly-owned treatment works utilizing the equivalency factors and taking into consideration the schedule for nitrogen removal construction projects;
2039
2140 (4) Monitor annual progress in meeting the fifteen-year implementation schedule in the total maximum daily load;
2241
2342 (5) Propose modifications, as may be necessary, to the general permit for nitrogen discharges;
2443
2544 (6) Oversee and execute all equivalent nitrogen credit exchanges;
2645
2746 (7) Maintain a separate account of state-owned equivalent nitrogen credits;
2847
2948 (8) [Purchase all equivalent nitrogen credits created by publicly-owned treatment works at the annually established value;] Not later than August 14, 2015, purchase all equivalent nitrogen credits created through December 31, 2014, by publicly-owned treatment works at the annually established value. Not later than August 14, 2016, purchase all equivalent nitrogen credits created through December 31, 2015, by publicly-owned treatment works at the annually established value. On or after August 15, 2016, purchase the equivalent nitrogen credits created by publicly-owned treatment works that are necessary to meet the nitrogen limits specified in the general permit for nitrogen discharges, issued pursuant to section 22a-522, at the annually established value;
3049
3150 (9) Sell available state-owned equivalent nitrogen credits including nitrogen credits purchased from publicly-owned treatment works at the annually established value to enable publicly-owned treatment works to meet nitrogen limits specified in the general permit for nitrogen discharges;
3251
3352 (10) Whenever practicable, sell remaining state-owned equivalent nitrogen credits to any other public or private entity;
3453
3554 (11) Establish accounts of funds created from the purchase and sale of equivalent nitrogen credits to be used for administration of the nitrogen credit exchange program and which may be used for nitrogen removal projects, habitat restoration projects and research;
3655
3756 (12) Establish any other policies or procedures the commissioner may deem necessary to carry out the nitrogen credit exchange program; and
3857
3958 (13) Establish a technical assistance program to educate and assist municipalities in implementing the nitrogen credit exchange program.
4059
4160 (c) (1) Not later than March thirty-first, annually, the commissioner shall audit the performance of each publicly-owned treatment works operating from January first to December thirty-first of the preceding year and shall (A) determine the number of equivalent nitrogen credits for sale and the number of equivalent nitrogen credits to be purchased, (B) publish the annual value of equivalent nitrogen credits as determined by the procedure established in section 22a-527, and (C) notify each publicly-owned treatment works of its equivalent nitrogen credit balance.
4261
4362 (2) Not later than July thirty-first, annually, each publicly-owned treatment works shall purchase equivalent nitrogen credits necessary to meet its nitrogen limits. Such purchase shall be paid by check, or money order or other form of payment acceptable to the Treasurer made payable to the "nitrogen credit exchange program". The check, or money order or other such form of payment shall state on its face "nitrogen credit purchase".
4463
4564 (3) Not later than August fourteenth, annually, until August 14, 2016, the commissioner shall purchase all available equivalent nitrogen credits. On or after August 15, 2016, annually, the commissioner shall purchase the equivalent nitrogen credits created by publicly-owned treatment works that are necessary to meet the nitrogen limits specified in the general permit for nitrogen discharges, issued pursuant to section 22a-522.
65+
66+
67+
68+
69+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
70+Section 1 from passage 22a-524
71+
72+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
73+
74+Section 1
75+
76+from passage
77+
78+22a-524
79+
80+
81+
82+ENV Joint Favorable
83+PD Joint Favorable
84+
85+ENV
86+
87+Joint Favorable
88+
89+PD
90+
91+Joint Favorable