Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-94
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 633
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7028
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 297
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 218
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|