Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 687
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 708
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 406
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|