Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Public Health | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | No New File by Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | File Number 658 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 380 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |