Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
File Number 862
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/18/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
File Number 662
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 381
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|