House | 04/19/2016 | File Number 662 | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | House Calendar Number 417 | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Public Hearing 02/08 | ||
House | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |