Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Public Act 16-86
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5828
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 547
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 5320
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
File Number 714
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
File Number 398
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
House Calendar Number 260
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|