House | 04/05/2016 | File Number 455 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | House Calendar Number 292 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |