Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 523 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | File Number 58 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 75 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |