Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-137
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
File Number 754
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 536
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5054
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
File Number 412
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
House Calendar Number 276
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|