Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 526 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | File Number 292 | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | House Calendar Number 216 | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |