House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-138
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 448
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
File Number 250
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 193
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|