House
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Special Act 16-13
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 581
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5738
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5564
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
File Number 251
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 194
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|