House
|
04/22/2016
|
File Number 709
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 482
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4225
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
File Number 360
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
House Calendar Number 254
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|