Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 499
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4855
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3898
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
File Number 430
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 288
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|