Senate | 04/26/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | File Number 674 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 428 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |