Senate | 04/19/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4085 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | File Number 172 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 161 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |