Senate | 04/29/2016 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | File Number 678 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | File Number 219 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 182 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |