House
|
06/20/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Senate Reconsidered, Veto Overruled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Senate Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Public Act 16-177
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2016
|
House Calendar Number 564
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
File Number 446
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 284
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|