Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2016

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016