Senate | 04/19/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | File Number 452 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 301 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |