Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | File Number 521 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 327 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |