House | 06/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 592 | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7727 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | File Number 111 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | House Calendar Number 106 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 01/19/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |