House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 531 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | File Number 421 | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 294 | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Public Hearing 01/30 | ||
House | 01/23/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |