House | 03/22/2017 | File Number 116 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | House Calendar Number 111 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 01/31 | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |