House | 03/17/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |