House | 04/03/2017 | File Number 348 | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 260 | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |