House
|
07/07/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-168
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
File Number 807
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 548
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6247
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
File Number 483
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
House Calendar Number 327
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|