Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill June 19, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2017
Bill April 10, 2017
Bill February 28, 2017