House
|
07/06/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-117
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
File Number 756
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 452
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6826
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
File Number 45
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
House Calendar Number 63
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|