Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2017
Bill March 13, 2017
Bill February 1, 2017