House | 05/05/2017 | File Number 725 | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 414 | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6688 | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6608 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 582 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 384 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/06/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |