House | 05/10/2017 | File Number 741 | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | House Calendar Number 498 | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |