House | 03/16/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Drafted by Committee |