House | 04/10/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 261 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 201 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |