House
|
06/13/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Public Act 17-44
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
File Number 683
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 378
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6036
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
File Number 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
House Calendar Number 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|