House
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-145
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8351
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
File Number 695
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
House Calendar Number 448
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|