House | 07/07/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/19/2017 | Special Act 17-11 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 401 | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | File Number 633 | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | House Calendar Number 404 | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |