House
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-140
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8827
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8601
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
File Number 771
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 459
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6917
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
File Number 328
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
House Calendar Number 243
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|