House | 06/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 586 | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/03/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/03/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6199 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 593 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 395 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |