Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Public Act 17-220
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
File Number 818
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 554
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7761
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
File Number 512
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
House Calendar Number 352
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|