House | 06/06/2017 | Bill Passed Temporary | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 8717 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | File Number 736 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 497 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Public Hearing 04/25 | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |