Senate | 04/13/2017 | File Number 605 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 326 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |