Senate | 05/26/2017 | House Calendar Number 590 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7548 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | File Number 469 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 243 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |