Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Public Act 17-90
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House Calendar Number 521
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 143
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 111
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|