Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2017
Bill March 22, 2017
Bill March 2, 2017