Senate | 04/25/2017 | No Action | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | File Number 48 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 77 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/08 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Vote to Draft |