Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 630 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8313 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | File Number 669 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 351 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Vote to Draft |